THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:23:52 PM
Mukherji, Atreyi
CPSO#:
67028
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Aug 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
ELM Medicine
Unit 4
1521 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON L8W 3J4
Phone: (905) 318-3006
Fax: 833-268-3660
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ATREYI MUKHERJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUKHERJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1997 |