THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 11:31:05 AM
Sawka, Annie Mary
CPSO#:
65043
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 12EN-212
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3678
Fax: (416) 340-3314
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:07 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNIE MARY SAWKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWKA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1993 |