THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:56:32 AM
Weir, Martina June Egan
CPSO#:
62725
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Egan, Martina June (used until: 16 Sep 1990 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-7763
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site |
Whitby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTINA JUNE EGAN WEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1991 |