THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:59:52 AM
Chow, David Robert
CPSO#:
62433
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8-125
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON M5T 2C2
Phone: (416) 867-7447
Fax: (416) 867-7445
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2005 |