THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:38:48 PM
Christakis, Monique Sabina
CPSO#:
62099
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Starok, Monique Sabina (used until: 31 Oct 1999 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Science Center
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5730
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONIQUE SABINA CHRISTAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTAKIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1991 |