THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:30:49 AM
Mulholland, Robert Stephen
CPSO#:
59297
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4471 Dean Martin Dr
Las Vegas NV 89103-4251
United States
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Although Dr. Stephen Mulholland, as of May 2021, has retired from active practice, his offices, SpaMedica Plastic Surgery, located at 66 Avenue Road, Suite 4, Toronto, remain open. A new Medical Director and CPSO certified Plastic Surgeon, Dr. Thomas Bell, has taken over the practice to manage all new referrals and prior patient care. The office number is 416-922-3743 and please ask for Clinic Manager, Leesa Richardson. All medical records are securely stored and follow the rules and regulations of the College of Physician and Surgeons of Ontario.
Date Received: 31 May 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 May 1988 to 12 Jun 1988
EL - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |