THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:19:29 AM
Garcia Pan, Luis Cesar
CPSO#:
55290
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: University of the Republic, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Cesar Garcia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |
Pending Hearings
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Garcia Pan’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that during a medical appointment in December, 2010, Dr. Garcia Pan engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct by, among other things, making inappropriate and/or sexual remarks to a patient, engaging in inappropriate and/or sexual touching of a patient and engaging in inappropriate and/or sexual behaviour towards a patient.
Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Motion: 2023-08-21 (Hearing in writing); Merits; 2024-04-22, 2024-04-23, 2024-04-24, 2024-05-01, 2024-05-02, 2024-05-07, 2024-05-08, 2024-05-09, 2024-05-13, 2024-05-15; 2024-07-03