THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:50:58 PM
Nikore, Veena
CPSO#:
55015
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Delhi, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
484 West Street
Brantford ON N3R 3W7
Phone: (519) 751-3604
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Veena Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019
Corporation Name: Veena Nikore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VEENA NIKORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKORE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 1984 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1986 |