THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:18:06 AM
Di Pierdomenico, Anthony Patrick
CPSO#:
53156
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Oct 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2425 Bloor Street West
Suite 207
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 766-4518
Fax: (416) 766-2407
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:27 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY PATRICK DI PIERDOMENICO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI PIERDOMENICO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 01 Dec 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2023 |