THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:39:40 AM
Queen, Martin
CPSO#:
51719
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Laboratory Office
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4779
Fax: (705) 675-4780
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:28 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN QUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUEEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1984 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 1988 |