THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:43:37 AM
Kandel, Gabor Peter
CPSO#:
50879
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Apr 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
16th floor -room 060a
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3093
Fax: (416) 864-3002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GABOR PETER KANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1978 to 18 Jun 1979
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 1998 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Nov 1991
Summary:
In November 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kandel guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Kandel be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that he be fined $5000.00.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 28 Nov 1991