THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:14:32 AM
Mathew, Mangalam Thomas
CPSO#:
44024
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Units19/20-6175 Highway 7
Integrated Healthcare Centre (iHeal
Vaughan ON L4H 0P6
Phone: 416 297 8362
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANGALAM THOMAS MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1985 |