THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 15:52:40 PM
Fingerote, Robert Joel
CPSO#:
43860
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
17-531 Atkinson Ave
Thornhill ON L4J 8L7
Phone: 905-763-3562
Fax: 905-763-0562
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:16 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOEL FINGEROTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINGEROTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 Aug 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2018 |