THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:13:41 AM
Bartolucci, Giampiero
CPSO#:
41976
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Feb 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Rome, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Giampiero Bartolucci Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 20 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:02 Dec 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Feb 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 18, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Giampiero Bartolucci to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 18, 2021:
Dr. Bartolucci was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct. The College also conducted two investigations into Dr. Bartolucci’s psychiatric practice.
In the face of these allegations and investigations, Dr. Bartolucci resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction in Canada.
Download Full Document (PDF)