THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:04:46 AM
Brown, Robert
CPSO#:
33017
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Sep 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Oct 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Dec 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Sep 2000 |