THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:16:49 AM
Keesari, Manohar
CPSO#:
33006
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
31 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Oct 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Osmania University, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Keesari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:13-1 High Meadow Pl
North York,ON
M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Mar 2021
Instructions/Address:Markham Office: Records stored at The Records Management
13-1 High Meadow Place, North York, Ontario M9L 0A3
Tel : 1-800-775-0093
Durham CAS, 320 Airport Blvd. Oshawa, Ontario L1J 0C6
Tel: (905) 433-1551
Date Received: 13 Feb 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2021 |