THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:39:25 AM
Shamess, Brian Albert
CPSO#:
32673
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Algoma Sports Medicine &
Physical Injuries Clinic
Suite 105
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2C5
Phone: (705) 759-2393
Fax: (705) 759-4835
Electoral District: 08
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 06 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 27 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 05 Jul 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2019 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 15, 2020, Dr. Shamess completed the requirements of the SCERP outlined below.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)