THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:46:50 AM
Weber, Elizabeth Anne
CPSO#:
32643
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jul 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:84 Trailwood Cres
Richmond Hill, Ontario
L4E 3L9
Canada
Date Received: 14 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology |
Effective:22 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |