THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:21:57 AM
Oestreicher, James Herbert
CPSO#:
32442
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
86 South Dr
Toronto ON M4W 1R6
Phone: 4169625005
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:12 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES HERBERT OESTREICHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OESTREICHER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1981 |