THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:09:37 AM
Lindzon, Ronald David
CPSO#:
32240
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cachet Medical Centre
9255 Woodbine Avenue. Suite 2
Markham ON L6C1Y9
Phone: (905) 887-2222
Fax: (905) 887-3655
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RONALD DAVID LINDZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDZON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Mar 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2020 |