THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 16:48:07 PM
Ashbury, Edwin Lindner
CPSO#:
32200
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Feb 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: E.L. Ashbury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 23 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |