THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:13:47 AM
Fallis, Geordie Walter Bouck
CPSO#:
32189
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Sep 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORDIE WALTER BOUCK FALLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1978 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Oct 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Mar 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Apr 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1983 |