THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 17:39:31 PM
Prabhakaran, Varagur Mohan
CPSO#:
32170
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Bangalore University, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Biochemistry |
Effective:02 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1995 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2019 |