THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:53:20 AM
Horsey, Mary Elizabeth
CPSO#:
32169
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 1963
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
2-Jul-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:call RSRS at 1.888.563.3732, or call the office number at 705.726.5453 for the next 6 months (end of Feb 2013)
RSRS Record Storage & Retreival Service
111 St. Regis Crescent
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 29 Aug 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jun 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2014 |