THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:44:39 AM
Enker, Irwin Paul
CPSO#:
32097
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Northern Boulevard
Suite 201
Great Neck NY 11021
United States
Phone: 516-838-8490
Fax: (516) 773-7575
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRWIN PAUL ENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1987 to 31 Mar 1987
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Sep 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Sep 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2003 |
Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: June 02, 2022
Summary:
Effective June 2, 2022, the New York State Administrative Review Board for Professional Medical Conduct made an Order finding that Dr. Enker had committed professional misconduct but declined to impose a penalty. This Order confirmed the determination by the New York Board of Professional Misconduct (BPMC) on December 8, 2021. The professional misconduct in question related to violations by Dr. Enker of the New York Public Health Laws for (a) failing to safeguard his Prescription Monitoring Program username and password, which resulted in unauthorized access to the Prescription Monitoring Program in 2015, and (b) by failing to consult the Prescription Monitoring Program prior to writing certain prescriptions for controlled substances in 2018. On November 11, 2019, Dr. Enker had entered into a Stipulation and Order with the New York Department of Health to settle an administrative enforcement action in which Dr. Enker admitted to violating the New York Public Health Laws and agreed to pay a civil monetary penalty of $4000.
The College was notified of this finding by a report from FSMB dated June 8, 2022.