THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:11:25 AM
Cole, Howard John
CPSO#:
32058
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Nov 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Howard Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Past paitents of Dr. Cole can send an email request for a copy of their file to: [email protected]
Date Received: 06 Dec 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |