THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:53:16 AM
Butler-Jones, David Alexander
CPSO#:
32036
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Nov 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Nov 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Eglantine Driveway
Ottawa ON K1A0K9
Phone: (613) 960-4480
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1980 |
CFPC Specialist |
Community Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER BUTLER-JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTLER-JONES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 1983 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2005 |