THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:44:28 PM
Hudson, Emmanuel William
CPSO#:
32026
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cross Cancer Institute
11560 University Ave.
Edmonton AB T6G 1Z2
Phone: (780) 432-8220
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:02 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL WILLIAM HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Sep 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1989 |