THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:57:07 AM
Lee, Peter
CPSO#:
32024
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Oct 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
21-Jun-2014
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Otago, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:26 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |