THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 6:58:05 AM
Ibrahim, Mohammed Aslam
CPSO#:
32023
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
2120 North Park Drive
brampton ontl6soc9
Brampton ON L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 453-3251
Fax: (905) 453-9623
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M.A. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2014
Corporation Name: Mohamed A. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:16 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ASLAM IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 1980 |