Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 17, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 17, 2021:
Dr. Yeung has ceased all practice related to Cannabis.
Dr. Yeung must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Yeung is prohibited from practicing in relation to Cannabis, including:
(i) The prescription, dispensing or administration of Cannabis;
(ii) Signing medical documents pursuant to the Cannabis Regulations, SOR/2018-144, or any equivalent documents, or participating in any way in the preparation, issuance or support of Cannabis documents, except for the sole and limited purpose of referring patients to other healthcare providers.
Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 29, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 29, 2021:
Dr. Yeung was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and incompetence. A College investigation was also commenced into his general practice.
In the face of the above allegations and investigation, effective June 1, 2021, Dr. Yeung resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 17, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 1, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dr. Clement Ka- Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 1, 2020:
The College has received information regarding Dr. Yeung’s standard of practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation, and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee:
Dr. Yeung will see no more than 4 patients per hour, for no more than 8 hours per day and no more than 5 days per week.
Dr. Yeung will not conduct house calls.
Dr. Yeung must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 8, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 8, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 8, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 15, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective February 15, 2019:
The College has received information regarding Dr. Yeung's prescribing practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee:
Dr. Yeung shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:
(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.
Dr. Yeung must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Yeung shall not prescribe or administer any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs
Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca