THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:37:57 PM
Lubelsky, Bruce Jack
CPSO#:
31969
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 209
Toronto ON M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 229-4941
Fax: (416) 229-4940
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:03 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRUCE JACK LUBELSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUBELSKY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1985 |