THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:22:54 AM
Montanera, Walter Joseph
CPSO#:
31960
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
CC3-075
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5671
Fax: (416) 864-5380
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:29 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WALTER JOSEPH MONTANERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTANERA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1984 |