THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:49:55 PM
Rochon, Luc Joseph Wilfrid
CPSO#:
31955
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1812 Appleford Street
Ottawa ON K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 762-5653
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:04 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUC JOSEPH WILFRID ROCHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jul 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 1984 |