THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:56:05 PM
Kruger, Kenneth Stephen
CPSO#:
31951
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
26 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Aug 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Requests for medical records regarding paitents can be sent to
4A - 2 Kennedy Rd S
Brampton ON L6W 3E1
Date Received: 14 Aug 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:24 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Nov 2020 |