THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:26:32 PM
Brasher, Jane Elizabeth Mary
CPSO#:
31908
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jun 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. Brasher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 May 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |