THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 11:14:11 AM
Weber, Gary Gregory
CPSO#:
31891
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Aug 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gary Weber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2008
Corporation Name: Gary Weber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 21 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. Weber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical record requests should be sent to:
65 Donly Drive North
Simcoe, ON
N3Y 0C2
Phone: 519-420-0011
Date Received: 31 May 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2021 |