THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:22:47 AM
Ross, Stephen George
CPSO#:
31882
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Dec 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1017 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON M3K 1Z1
Phone: 4167895012
Fax: 4167895072
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN GEORGE ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 07 Dec 2004 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 07 Dec 2004 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 17 Dec 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2006 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Oct 2004
Summary:
On October 18, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ross to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful or unprofessional.
On December 7, 2004, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following:
1. Dr. Ross appear before the Committee to be reprimanded and the reprimand be recorded in the Register.
2. The Registrar suspend Dr. Ross s licence for six (6) months commencing the date of this order. The suspension will itself be suspended provided that Dr. Ross complies with the following conditions and requirements, which shall be terms, conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration.
3. Dr. Ross receive treatment by a Psychiatrist of his choosing acceptable to the College, until the later of (a) the date on which the treating psychiatrist is satisfied that the treatment has been successful, and (b) the date which is two years from the date of this order. The treating Psychiatrist shall undertake to provide reports every six (6) months to the Registrar reporting on the progress of treatment of the conditions that influence Dr. Ross s ability to practice medicine, with the first report due six months from the date of this Order. Dr. Ross shall be responsible for any financial obligations relating to the treatment and reporting.
4. Dr. Ross submit to the College the name of a physician acceptable to the College who act as his practice supervisor and will report every three months to the College as to the appropriateness of his behaviour and interaction with patients and staff at his practice location, as well as the appropriateness of his workload. This supervised practice and reporting shall continue for at least one year. Following that year, Dr. Ross shall continue in supervised practice until his treating Psychiatrist is of the opinion that Dr. Ross has a low risk of re-offending and has reported that opinion to the College. Dr. Ross shall be responsible for any costs relating to his practice supervision and reporting.
5. For the period of one year, Dr. Ross may only attend female patients in the presence of a registered health professional who is acceptable to the College and will report on the appropriateness of Dr. Ross s behaviour to his practice supervisor.
6. Dr. Ross may not practice at the hospital he practised at for a period of one year from the date of this order, and only after conditions in paragraph 4 above are satisfied.
7. Dr. Ross shall deliver to the College certificates of completion of the courses taken in Boundaries and Communication during the past two years.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 07, 2004