THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:11:28 AM
Cowan, William Dean
CPSO#:
31879
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Aug 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:13 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jul 2013 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 20, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Cowan was subject to an investigation by the College on allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. While the investigation was ongoing, Dr. Cowan resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.