THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:21:32 AM
Alberti, Peter William Richard Mayer
CPSO#:
31867
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jul 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Durham, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1980 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 1996 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 31 Dec 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2007 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Oct 1996
Summary:
In October 1996, Dr. Alberti pleaded guilty to the charge of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional contrary to paragraph 27.32 of Regulation 448/80, and paragraph 29.33 of Ontario Regulation 548/90. The Discipline Committee accepted his plea, and found Dr. Alberti guilty of professional misconduct. The Committee imposed the following penalty:
- Dr. Alberti(s certificate of registration is suspended for a period of 6 months commencing on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, however 5 months of the suspension shall be suspended provided that Dr. Alberti complies with the following conditions:
(I) Dr. Alberti shall provide evidence of having paid the sum of $130,000 in the manner hereinafter set out:
(a) $100,000 shall be paid in two installments, $35,000 before December 31, 1996, and $65,000 before December 31, 1997, respectively, to Mount Sinai Hospital Foundation for academic enrichment and research in the Department of Otolaryngology at the hospital;
(b) $30,000 shall be paid directly to the Department of Otolaryngology, Mount Sinai Hospital, by December 31, 1996.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 07, 1996