THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:15:10 AM
Schwartz, Roslyn Taube
CPSO#:
31847
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Aug 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 1982
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
171 College Street
Kingston ON K7L 4L9
Phone: (613) 548-4396
Fax: (613) 548-8011
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1981 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROSLYN TAUBE SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jan 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1982 |