THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:45:33 PM
Finnie, Keith James Campbell
CPSO#:
31750
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jul 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Keith J. C. Finnie Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:26 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |