THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:40:59 AM
Martin del Campo, Jose Cuauhtemoc
CPSO#:
31745
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Apr 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Apr 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 892-6067
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:04 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSE CUAUHTEMOC MARTIN DEL CAMPO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN DEL CAMPO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1989 |