THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:23:51 AM
Mulloy, John Vickers
CPSO#:
31731
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1122 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON P3A 1Y4
Phone: (705) 222-2121
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Dec 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN VICKERS MULLOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLOY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1980 |