THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:51:21 AM
Chung, Wilfred Wing Fan
CPSO#:
31716
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: March 5, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 5, 2021, Kemptville District Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Wilfred Wing Fan Chung has voluntarily ceased to practise at Kemptville District Hospital. His privileges will expire by September 20, 2021.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2022 |