THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:18:12 AM
Sherwood, Margaret Lynn
CPSO#:
31712
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sherwood, Margaret Lynn (used until: 26 Jul 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jul 1990 |