THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:02:03 AM
Lancaster, Bobbi D
CPSO#:
31711
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Lancaster, Robert Douglas (used until: 13 Feb 2018 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1980 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2019 |