THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:08:35 AM
Cameron, Douglas Alexander
CPSO#:
31705
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
06 May 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Douglas A. Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Health Record Services
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave.
Floor 3b, Room 202
Toronto, ON M5G 2M9
Phone: 416 946 4501 ext. 4711
Date Received: 07 May 2019
Instructions/Address:Requests for medical records should be directed to the University Health Network's (Toronto General Division) medical record department
Date Received: 08 Jan 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 May 2019 |