THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:14:23 AM
Skinner, Christopher Robin Rufus
CPSO#:
31672
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-5353
Fax: (613) 761-5360
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:24 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ROBIN RUFUS SKINNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKINNER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1980 |