THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:09:04 AM
Hickey, Nancy Marilyn
CPSO#:
31664
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 May 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Sep 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 1996 |